ND HB1367 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of railroad crossings.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of railroad crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |