ND 1366 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 35-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the nonjudicial disposition of property by lienholders; and to amend and reenact sections 35-13-01, 35-13-04, 35-13-05, and 35-13-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to repairman's liens, priority of liens, notice requirements, and assignments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repairman's liens, priority of liens, notice requirements, and assignments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Governor 03/25
2021-03-24HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-17SenateSigned by President
2021-03-16HouseReturned to House
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-12SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-02-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-02-11HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback