ND HB1366 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 57-51-01 and section 57-51-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to oil and gas gross production tax definitions and allocations; to provide an appropriation to the board of university and school lands; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Oil and gas gross production tax definitions and allocations; to provide an appropriation to the board of university and school lands; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Sukut [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 54 |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |