ND 1364 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 19-24.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to health council rules regulating edible medical marijuana products; to amend and reenact section 19-24.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to edible medical marijuana products; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Edible medical marijuana products; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 18
2019-03-26SenateReconsidered
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, failed, lacks two-thirds majority yeas 28 nays 17
2019-03-22SenateLaid over one legislative day
2019-03-20SenateReported back without recommendation 6 0 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-19SenateReceived from House
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 21, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 7 2
2019-02-11HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback