ND 1361 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 57-15-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations of property tax levies by taxing districts without voter approval; to amend and reenact section 57-20-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the abstract of a county tax list and a statewide property tax increase report; to repeal section 57-20-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to certification of taxes levied by taxing districts; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certification of taxes levied by taxing districts; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
2017-04-24SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 32
2017-04-21HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-20HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19SenateAppoint Sen. Laffen to replace Sen. Cook on conference committee
2017-04-14SenateConference committee appointed Cook Unruh Dotzenrod
2017-04-13HouseConference committee appointed Dockter B. Koppelman Toman
2017-04-13HouseRefused to concur
2017-04-12HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3
2017-04-12SenateDivision B passed
2017-04-12SenateDivision A lost
2017-04-12SenateDivision of bill
2017-04-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-04-07SenateRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2017-04-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 34
2017-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1361.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-05004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-05005a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-07000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-08000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-05014a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0202-09000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-30.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-73.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-74.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback