ND HB1359 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 64-02-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the calibration of instruments used to measure grain protein.
Title
The calibration of instruments used to measure grain protein.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] |
Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-02 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 70 | |
2011-01-28 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 0 3 | |
2011-01-27 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1359.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0590-02000.pdf |