ND 1358 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the use of open educational resources in the elementary and secondary school system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the use of open educational resources in the elementary and secondary school system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2017-03-17HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-13SenateSigned by President
2017-03-10HouseReturned to House
2017-03-09SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-08SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12
2017-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback