ND HB1357 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 8 of section 20.1-03-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for gratis licenses to hunt moose.
Title
Eligibility for gratis licenses to hunt moose.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 66 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |