ND 1357 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study regarding the effects of placing limits on school district levies on the equitable application of the education funding formula.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study regarding the effects of placing limits on school district levies on the equitable application of the education funding formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-13SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
2017-03-10SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-19HouseRereferred to Education
2017-01-19HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback