ND HB1356 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-19.1-28, 48-01.2-02.1, and 48-01.2-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bids, plans, and specifications for public improvements and bond thresholds.
Title
Bids, plans, and specifications for public improvements and bond thresholds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 17 |
2019-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed J. Lee Burckhard Dotzenrod |
2019-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Pyle M. Johnson Fegley |
2019-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 6 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 37 |
2019-02-20 | House | Reconsidered |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 51 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |