ND HB1355 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-08-01.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sealing a criminal record.
Title
Sealing a criminal record.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Gary Paur [R] |
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |