ND 1355 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of political subdivision funding mechanisms for transportation infrastructure projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of political subdivision funding mechanisms for transportation infrastructure projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 36 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 57
2017-01-26HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 1
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback