ND HB1354 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact subdivision z of subsection 2 of section 28-32-01 and chapter 54-67 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the commission on guardianship; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-24.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the commission on guardianship and exempt administrative agencies; to provide a penalty; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
The commission on guardianship and exempt administrative agencies; to provide a penalty; to provide for a legislative management report; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 41 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 41 nays 53 |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2021-02-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass 12 2 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-27 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2021-01-27 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |