ND HB1354 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-06-14.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to leave for state employee volunteers.
Title
Leave for state employee volunteers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2019-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 11 |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |