ND 1353 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 15.1-36-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a common schools building and renovation grant fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide for a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A common schools building and renovation grant fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; and to provide for a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 7 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 85
2019-01-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback