ND 1353 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the creation of a college tuition waiver or reimbursement program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the creation of a college tuition waiver or reimbursement program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 63
2017-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-30HouseRereferred to Education
2017-01-27HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback