ND HB1352 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for liability for medical products.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for liability for medical products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 83 |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |