ND 1352 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a motor vehicle ferry; to provide a contingent appropriation; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The creation of a motor vehicle ferry; to provide a contingent appropriation; and to provide a contingent effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
2019-01-28HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-25HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback