ND 1352 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 24-03-23, 39-26-02, 39-26-04, 39-26-06, 39-26-07, and 39-26-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to custody and disposition of abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custody and disposition of abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Governor 04/05
2017-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-03-31HouseConcurred
2017-03-15HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-14SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-03-14SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2017-02-13HouseRereferred to Transportation
2017-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1352.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-01000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-01005a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-01006a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-03001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0687-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-46.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-59.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback