ND HB1351 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-39.2-04 and a new subsection to section 57-40.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for sales made to a senior citizen organization; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A sales and use tax exemption for sales made to a senior citizen organization; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2021-03-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-12 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 2 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 3 3 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |