ND HB1350 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 15.1-36-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a common schools revolving loan fund; to amend and reenact section 15-03-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legal investments; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a contingent effective date.
Title
Legal investments; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 77 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |