ND 1349 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapter 4.1-18.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of hemp; to amend and reenact subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and subsection 22 of section 19-24.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal history background checks and the definition of marijuana; to repeal chapter 4.1-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of industrial hemp; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The regulation of industrial hemp; to provide a penalty; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/28
2019-03-28HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-27SenateSigned by President
2019-03-26HouseReturned to House
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-03-22SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2019-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-14SenateReported back, do pass 5 0 1
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Agriculture Committee
2019-02-27SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-19HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 20 1 0
2019-02-06HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback