ND 1348 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 54-59-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the statewide longitudinal data system committee and biennial training for individuals who have access to the statewide longitudinal data system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The statewide longitudinal data system committee and biennial training for individuals who have access to the statewide longitudinal data system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 90
2019-01-29HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-14HouseRereferred to Education
2019-01-14HouseRequest return from committee
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback