ND 1348 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 36-21.2-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the seizure of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The seizure of animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-14HouseSigned by Governor 03/13
2017-03-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-08HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-08SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseReturned to House
2017-03-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-03SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2017-03-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 9
2017-02-03HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 3 2
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2017-01-19HouseRereferred to Agriculture
2017-01-19HouseRequest return from committee
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback