ND 1346 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-06-04, 15.1-27-23, and 15.1-27-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to required number of hours of instruction by school districts, average daily membership calculation, and weather emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required number of hours of instruction by school districts, average daily membership calculation, and weather emergencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 90
2019-04-18HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-18HouseReported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede)
2019-04-10SenateConference committee appointed Schaible Elkin Marcellais
2019-04-08HouseConference committee appointed Owens Zubke Guggisberg
2019-04-08HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-29HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0
2019-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 01:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2019-02-01SenateReceived from House
2019-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 5
2019-01-25HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback