ND HB1345 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 43-31-07, 43-31-09, 43-31-10, and 43-31-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the licensing of detection of deception examiners and to repeal sections 43-31-07.1 and 43-31-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to internship licenses and exemptions from testing requirements of detection of deception examiners.
Title
Internship licenses and exemptions from testing requirements of detection of deception examiners.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2021-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |