ND 1345 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact subsections 12 and 13 of section 44-04-18, subsection 6 of section 44-04-18.1, and section 11 of section 44-04-19.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to open record and meeting laws; to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 12.1-34-02, section 12.1-35-03, subsection 9 of section 44-04-17.1, subsections 2, 4, and 7 of section 44-04-18, subsection 2 of section 44-04-18.1, subsection 6 of section 44-04-18.7, section 44-04-18.20, subsections 5, 6, and 9 of section 44-04-19.1, subsections 3 and 5 of section 44-04-20, section 44-04-21.1, and subsection 4 of section 57-40.6-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to open record and meeting laws; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open record and meeting laws; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/11
2017-04-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President
2017-04-04HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
2017-04-04HouseConcurred
2017-03-10HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-09SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-03-09SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-08SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2017-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback