ND 1343 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-10.2-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rights of health care facility residents to use electronic communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of health care facility residents to use electronic communication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-18HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-16SenateSigned by President
2021-03-12HouseReturned to House
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-10SenateReceived from House
2021-02-09HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-02-03HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback