ND 1343 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 5-01-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to domestic winery ingredient utilization requirements and special event permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic winery ingredient utilization requirements and special event permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
2017-04-04SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-04-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback