ND 1342 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 54-52-02.9, subsection 2 of section 54-52-05, subsection 1 of section 54-52-06, subsection 6 of section 54-52.6-02, subsection 1 of section 54-52.6-09, and subsection 2 of section 54-52.6-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increased employer and employee contributions under the public employees retirement system defined benefit and defined contribution plans; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a statement of legislative intent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 57
2021-02-19HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-12HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback