ND HB1341 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 34-06-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state minimum wage rate.
Title
The state minimum wage rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82 |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |