ND HB1341 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 3 and 7 of section 19-03.1-23 and subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-23.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the elimination of enhanced penalties for manufacturing, delivering, or possessing controlled substances near schools; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The elimination of enhanced penalties for manufacturing, delivering, or possessing controlled substances near schools; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by Governor 04/18 |
2017-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 2 |
2017-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Armstrong D. Larson Nelson |
2017-04-06 | House | Conference committee appointed Paur Blum Hanson |
2017-04-06 | House | Refused to concur |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6 |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 3 0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |