ND 1339 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the definitions of "dangerous weapon" and "public gathering".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the definitions of "dangerous weapon" and "public gathering".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HouseSigned by Governor 04/01
2021-03-31HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-30SenateSigned by President
2021-03-29HouseReturned to House
2021-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 4
2021-03-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 1
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 28
2021-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback