ND HB1339 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reimbursement for warranty.
Title
Reimbursement for warranty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2019-04-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to House |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2019-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |