ND 1339 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 61-16.1-22, 61-16.1-23, and 61-16.1-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notice, appeals, and refunds of special assessments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice, appeals, and refunds of special assessments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17HouseSigned by Governor 04/14
2017-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-12SenateSigned by President
2017-04-10SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 5
2017-04-10SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-07SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 9
2017-04-07HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-07HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-03SenateConference committee appointed D. Larson Anderson J. Lee
2017-03-30HouseConference committee appointed B. Koppelman C. Johnson Rohr
2017-03-30HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-22HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-21SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2017-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-21SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-21SenateReceived from House
2017-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 13
2017-02-13HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1339.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-03004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-04001a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-05000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-04002a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-06000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-0752-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-51.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-64.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-65.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback