ND HB1338 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 11-27-01 and 40-49-01, subsection 1 of section 40-49-12, and section 40-49-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disposal of property; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Disposal of property; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] |
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2019-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |