ND 1338 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-06-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to indigent burial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indigent burial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseSigned by Governor 04/05
2017-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-03SenateSigned by President
2017-03-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0
2017-03-31HouseConcurred
2017-03-20HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-17SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 30 nays 16
2017-03-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-01HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2017-01-30HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-01-27HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2017-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback