ND HB1337 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15.1-12-07, 15.1-12-26, and 15.1-12-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the transfer of property of dissolved school districts.
Title
The transfer of property of dissolved school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. David Richter [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Sen. David Rust [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7 |
2021-04-15 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-05 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2021-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |