ND 1337 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to required reading of historical documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Required reading of historical documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
2017-03-08SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-07SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 35
2017-02-08HouseReconsidered
2017-02-07HouseSecond reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 42
2017-01-31HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback