ND HB1336 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 1 of section 14-02.1-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to printed information by state department of health; and to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 14-02.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to informed consent requirements before an abortion.
Title
Informed consent requirements before an abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2019-03-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-18 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 11 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 16 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 3 3 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-01-15 | House | Rereferred to Human Services |
2019-01-15 | House | Request return from committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |