ND HB1336 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 20.1-08-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the proclamation for paddlefish tags.
Title
The proclamation for paddlefish tags.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wall [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Clark Williams [D] |
Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2013-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2013-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 6 |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 0 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |