ND HB1336 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to repeal chapter 54-35.2 and section 54-40.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the advisory commission on intergovernmental relations.
Title
The advisory commission on intergovernmental relations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Glen Froseth [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Rep. Dwight Wrangham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41 | |
2011-03-23 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-18 | Received from House | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 58 nays 36 | |
2011-02-14 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 0 | |
2011-02-04 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1336.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0169-01000.pdf |