ND 1335 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 26.1-39-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property and casualty insurance covered loss.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property and casualty insurance covered loss.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 1 N: 93 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 93
2017-01-26HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback