ND 1333 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Committee Hearing 10:30
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of an innovation grant fund to support technology advancement committee and grant program; to provide an exemption; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The creation of an innovation grant fund to support technology advancement committee and grant program; to provide an exemption; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide for a transfer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-08SenateAmendment adopted
2019-03-07SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2019-02-12SenateReceived from House
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 20
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback