ND HB1333 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 16.1-01-04, 16.1-05-07, and 16.1-07-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to voting requirements, qualifications of electors, and voter identification.
Title
Voting requirements, qualifications of electors, and voter identification.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/23 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 23 |
2015-04-21 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 9 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 1 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 24 |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |