ND 1332 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 16.1-02-05, subsection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility to vote.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/18
2013-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2013-04-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-04-16SenateSigned by President
2013-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 68 nays 24
2013-04-12HouseConcurred
2013-04-04HouseReturned to House (12)
2013-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 30 nays 16
2013-04-02SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 6 0
2013-04-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-03-26SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2013-03-26SenateAmendment adopted
2013-03-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 2 0
2013-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2013-02-28SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2013-02-27SenateReceived from House
2013-02-26HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 21
2013-02-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2013-02-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 1
2013-02-12HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2013-02-12HouseAmendment adopted
2013-02-11HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2013-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2013-01-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback