ND 1330 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 12.1-20-12.1 and 23-12-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to breastfeeding; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breastfeeding; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
2019-02-06HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2019-01-21HouseCommittee Hearing 02:40
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback