ND HB1330 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-35-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the membership of the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The membership of the legislative management; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 11, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 8 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 11, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |