ND 1329 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 4.1-53-13, subsection 1 of section 4.1-53-37, section 4.1-53-38, subsection 2 of section 4.1-53-43, subsection 1 of section 4.1-53-48, and subsection 2 of section 4.1-53-61 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to seed labels, tolerances, permits, and certification; to repeal section 4.1-53-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonresident seed dealer licenses; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonresident seed dealer licenses; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Governor 03/25
2021-03-24HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-17SenateSigned by President
2021-03-16HouseReturned to House
2021-03-15SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2021-03-12SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2021-02-04SenateReceived from House
2021-02-03HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2021-01-29HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback