ND HB1329 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 29-04-02 and 29-04-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to statute of limitations in possession of stolen property or services.
Title
Statute of limitations in possession of stolen property or services.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacy Dahl [R] | Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Governor 04/19 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Concurred | |
2011-03-29 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-03-25 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Received from House | |
2011-01-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 | |
2011-01-26 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-25 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |